OK SB737 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB737
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Filmed in Oklahoma Act of 2021; modifying certain rate of reimbursement; modifying requirements for promotional materials. Emergency.
Title
Filmed in Oklahoma Act of 2021; modifying certain rate of reimbursement; modifying requirements for promotional materials. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/22/2023 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-05-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Tedford |
2023-04-19 | Senate | HAs read |
2023-04-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 8 |
2023-04-18 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2023-04-18 | House | General Order |
2023-04-18 | House | House Rule suspended |
2023-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Finance Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hall |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB737 (Carry Over) 2023-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2023