OK SB734 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB734
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription drugs; prohibiting certain entities from purchasing prescription drugs in excess of certain rate. Effective date.
Title
Prescription drugs; prohibiting certain entities from purchasing prescription drugs in excess of certain rate. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hicks |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB734 (Carry Over) 2021-03-01 - Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed