OK SB732 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Uniform Consumer Credit Code; modifying reference amounts from Reference Base Index; modifying loan finance charges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Consumer Credit Code; modifying reference amounts from Reference Base Index; modifying loan finance charges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateApproved by Governor 04/25/2019
2019-04-23SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-18HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-18HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 6
2019-04-18HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
2019-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-03-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-18SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
2019-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-28SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2019-02-28SenateEmergency removed
2019-02-28SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Leewright
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback