OK SB732 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-18 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-18 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Public Employees Retirement System; enacting the Sooner Save Special Act; defined contribution plan. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Public Employees Retirement System; enacting the Sooner Save Special Act; defined contribution plan. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Pensions committee; CR filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Shannon (principal House author) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Pensions |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brinkley |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |