OK SB727 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB727
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foster care; investigations of abuse or neglect; placement; guidelines; annual credit report for youth in custody of DHS; effective date.
Title
Foster care; investigations of abuse or neglect; placement; guidelines; annual credit report for youth in custody of DHS; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/25/2017 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-11 | Senate | SCs named Griffin, Yen, Simpson, Silk, Rader, Floyd, Matthews |
2017-05-10 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Children, Youth and Family Services |
2017-05-04 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-04-19 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-18 | House | General Order |
2017-04-12 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2017-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2017-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Ownbey (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB727 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10A | 1 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 4 | 204 | New Code | See Bill Text |