OK SB719 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB719
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Roads and bridges; creating the County Infrastructure Disbursement Fund. Effective date.
Title
Roads and bridges; creating the County Infrastructure Disbursement Fund. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator David |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Remove as author Senator David; authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB719 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb719&Session=2000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB719%20INT.PDF |