OK SB716 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Used Motor Vehicle and Parts Commission; setting fee for certain manufactured homes. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Used Motor Vehicle and Parts Commission; setting fee for certain manufactured homes. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateApproved by Governor 04/29/2019
2019-04-24SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-24HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-24SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 4
2019-04-23HouseGeneral Order
2019-03-28HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
2019-03-12SenateTitle restored
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-14SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Leewright
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback