OK SB715 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB715
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Veto override message received
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Veto override message received
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Open Records Act; requiring certain notification for denial of access to records; authorizing court orders for release of certain records. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Open Records Act; requiring certain notification for denial of access to records; authorizing court orders for release of certain records. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate: VETO OVERRIDE NO EMERGENCY (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | House | Veto override message received |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Measure sent to House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Veto overridden: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Vetoed 05/05/2023 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1 |
2023-04-27 | House | General Order |
2023-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2023-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB715 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - Veto override message received