OK SB715 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Protective orders; creating the Protection from Workplace Harassment and Violence Act; allowing employers to file protective orders on behalf of certain employees. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protective orders; creating the Protection from Workplace Harassment and Violence Act; allowing employers to file protective orders on behalf of certain employees. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenateApproved by Governor 05/29/2019
2019-05-23SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-23HouseTo Senate
2019-05-23HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 1
2019-05-23HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 13
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-15SenateTitle restored
2019-05-15SenateCCR read
2019-05-06HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary
2019-05-02SenateSCs named Paxton, Daniels, Leewright, Weaver, Boren, Floyd
2019-04-30SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-04SenateHAs read
2019-04-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-03HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 5
2019-04-03HouseGeneral Order
2019-03-27HouseEnacting clause stricken
2019-03-27HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)
2019-02-26SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-26SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Paxton
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb715&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB715%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB715%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB715%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB715%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB715%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB715%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB715%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB715%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB715_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB715_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback