OK SB715 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB715
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Vetoed 05/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Vetoed 05/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Speech Pathology and Audiology Licensing Act; clarifying various definitions; qualifications for licensure.
Title
Speech Pathology and Audiology Licensing Act; clarifying various definitions; qualifications for licensure.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg McCortney [R] | Rep. Dale Derby [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] | Sen. Ervin Yen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 53 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 53 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Vetoed 05/17/2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-11 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-10 | House | Motion expired |
2017-04-05 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Derby |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 37; Ayes: 50 Nays: 27 |
2017-04-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh) |
2017-04-05 | House | General Order |
2017-03-28 | House | Emergency added |
2017-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2017-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Emergency failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 15 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 15 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Derby (principal House author) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Emergency added |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Yen |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Yen; authored by McCortney |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yen |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB715 (Carry Over) 2017-05-17 - Vetoed 05/17/2017