OK SB71 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB71

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Higher education; providing for a performance audit on the State Regents for Higher Education. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education; providing for a performance audit on the State Regents for Higher Education. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-20SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2017-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Loveless
2017-02-08Senatecoauthored by Sears (principal House author)
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Daniels
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB71 (Carry Over) 2017-02-20 - Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7032187Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback