OK SB709 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB709
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Commissioner of Health; exempting Commissioner from certain qualifications under certain conditions; creating the position of Chief Medical Officer. Emergency.
Title
State Commissioner of Health; exempting Commissioner from certain qualifications under certain conditions; creating the position of Chief Medical Officer. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2022 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2022-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-04-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 20 |
2022-04-20 | House | General Order |
2022-04-13 | House | Emergency added |
2022-04-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2022-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Emergency failed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Remove as author Senator McCortney; authored by Senator Rosino |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB709 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services