OK SB709 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-19 - coauthored by Martin (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-19 - coauthored by Martin (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher recruitment; creating the Oklahoma Teacher Recruitment Act; establishing eligibility. Effective date.
Title
Teacher recruitment; creating the Oklahoma Teacher Recruitment Act; establishing eligibility. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | Senate | coauthored by Martin (principal House author) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | coauthored by Mazzei |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 6 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 214 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 218 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 219 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb709&Session=1600 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB709%20INT.PDF |