OK SB708 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB708
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
Pending: House Judiciary - Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
Pending: House Judiciary - Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Charitable organizations; requiring notice to Attorney General from charitable organization prior to transfer of assets under certain circumstances. Effective date.
Title
Charitable organizations; requiring notice to Attorney General from charitable organization prior to transfer of assets under certain circumstances. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2022-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Phillips |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Remove as principal author Representative Phillips and substitute with Representative Boatman |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Leewright; authored by Senator Daniels |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Phillips (principal House author) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB708 (Carry Over) 2021-03-02 - Coauthored by Representative Phillips (principal House author)