OK SB708 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB708
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Coauthored by Representative Phillips (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Coauthored by Representative Phillips (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Telecommunications; providing method for determining permissible rate increases. Effective date.
Title
Telecommunications; providing method for determining permissible rate increases. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Phillips (principal House author) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB708 (Carry Over) 2021-03-02 - Coauthored by Representative Phillips (principal House author)