OK SB706 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide Virtual Charter School Board; directing the Board to enter into contracts with certain full-time providers. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Statewide Virtual Charter School Board; directing the Board to enter into contracts with certain full-time providers. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-04-02 | House | Withdrawn from Common Education Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Common Education |
2019-04-01 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2019-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fincher (principal House author) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB706 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget