OK SB705 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB705
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Aircraft excise tax; distributuion of revenue and application of certain cap.
Title
Aircraft excise tax; distributuion of revenue and application of certain cap.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 22 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 22 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 7 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Fields |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 22 Nays: 20 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wright (principal House author) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fields |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB705 (Carry Over) 2017-04-17 - Enacting clause stricken