OK SB702 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Environment; establishing a moratorium on certain permits; providing conditions to end legislative moratoria; requiring certain agencies to coordinate rule promulgations related to water. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment; establishing a moratorium on certain permits; providing conditions to end legislative moratoria; requiring certain agencies to coordinate rule promulgations related to water. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseCR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8
2019-03-13SenateTitle restored
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Branham
2019-02-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Simpson
2019-02-21SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-21SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
2019-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2019-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
2019-02-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Kidd
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator McCortney
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback