OK SB701 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-23 - coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-23 - coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; creating privilege for insurance compliance self-evaluative audit. Emergency.
Title
Insurance; creating privilege for insurance compliance self-evaluative audit. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-11 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Brown | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 6830 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6831 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6832 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6833 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6834 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6835 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6836 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6837 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb701&Session=1000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2009-10bills/SB/sb701_int.rtf |