OK SB691 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB691
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Vehicle weight and load; clarifying weight load and penalties for certain overweight vehicles.
Title
Vehicle weight and load; clarifying weight load and penalties for certain overweight vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Avery Frix [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules |
2019-04-10 | House | Withdrawn from Transportation Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB691 (Carry Over) 2019-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken