OK SB686 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB686
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-20 - Coauthored by Representative Talley (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-20 - Coauthored by Representative Talley (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Children's Code; modifying information required to be provided to foster parents. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Children's Code; modifying information required to be provided to foster parents. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Talley (principal House author) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rader |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pederson |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB686 (Carry Over) 2023-02-20 - Coauthored by Representative Talley (principal House author)