OK SB679 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children and Juvenile Code; modifying provisions. Effective date.
Title
Children and Juvenile Code; modifying provisions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/31/2013 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 1 |
2013-05-24 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Johnson (Constance) |
2013-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-23 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-05-22 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-07 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-06 | Senate | SCs named Griffin, Sykes, Shumate, McAffrey, Brooks, Shaw |
2013-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 |
2013-04-23 | House | General Order |
2013-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2013-02-19 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1101 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 130 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 130 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 130 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 130 | 4 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 130 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 130 | 6 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 130 | 7 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 130 | 8 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 130 | 9 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 600 | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
43A | 5 | 507 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 24 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |