OK SB676 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-15 - Coauthored by Senator Jett
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Crime and punishment; providing definition; providing certain penalty. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime and punishment; providing definition; providing certain penalty. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Jett
2021-02-08SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Hamilton
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback