OK SB674 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB674
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearm permits; modifying inclusions to include municipal judges. Effective date.
Title
Firearm permits; modifying inclusions to include municipal judges. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kidd |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB674 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed