OK SB671 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-20 - Ayes: 22 Nays: 75
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-20 - Ayes: 22 Nays: 75
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Office of the Chief Medical Examiner; renaming Office of Forensic Medical Examinations. Emergency.
Title
Office of the Chief Medical Examiner; renaming Office of Forensic Medical Examinations. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Marian Cooksey [R] | Rep. Randon Grau [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] |
Rep. Randy McDaniel [R] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 22 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Ayes: 22 Nays: 75 | |
2011-05-20 | CCR failed of adoption | |
2011-05-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Randy) | |
2011-05-20 | CCR considered | |
2011-05-19 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-19 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-19 | coauthored by Marlatt | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-18 | Title restored | |
2011-05-18 | CCR read | |
2011-05-17 | SCs named Jolley, Myers, Treat, Johnson (Rob), Burrage, Sparks | |
2011-05-17 | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference | |
2011-05-09 | SCs named GCCA | |
2011-05-09 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2011-05-04 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-05-02 | HAs read | |
2011-05-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 8 | |
2011-04-27 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cooksey, Roan | |
2011-04-27 | General Order | |
2011-03-30 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-03-08 | First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-07 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1150 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 1150 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1313 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1154 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 1168 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 1602 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
22 | 751 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
51 | 24A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 396 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 329 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 309D | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 315 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2200 | 23A | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 93 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 931 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 932 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 933 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 934 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 935 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 935 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 936 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 937 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 938 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 939 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 940 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 941 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 941a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 942 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 943 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 944 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 944 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 945 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 946 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 947 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 948 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 948 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 949 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 950 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 951 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 954 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 150 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |