OK SB671 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-08 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules and Agency Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-08 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules and Agency Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Sunset; recreating certain entities; modifying termination date.
Title
Sunset; recreating certain entities; modifying termination date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-07 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Agency Oversight: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules and Agency Oversight Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Agency Oversight | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-03 | Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-03 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-18 | coauthored by Wright (John) (principal House author) | |
2009-02-18 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Wright (John) | |
2009-02-16 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Aldridge | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |