OK SB646 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB646
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; modifying prohibition against carrying weapon where alcohol is served. Effective date.
Title
Firearms; modifying prohibition against carrying weapon where alcohol is served. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] | Rep. Jay Steagall [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Tom Gann [R] |
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Robert Manger [R] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 16 |
2021-04-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger, Roberts (Sean) |
2021-04-21 | House | General Order |
2021-03-30 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Gann |
2021-03-30 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Title restored |
2021-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2021-03-09 | Senate | coauthored by McDugle |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB646 (Carry Over) 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021