OK SB643 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB643
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
All-terrain vehicles; modifying certain areas where all-terrain vehicles are allowed to operate. Effective date.
Title
All-terrain vehicles; modifying certain areas where all-terrain vehicles are allowed to operate. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Silk |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB643 (Carry Over) 2019-03-12 - Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author)