OK SB643 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

All-terrain vehicles; modifying certain areas where all-terrain vehicles are allowed to operate. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

All-terrain vehicles; modifying certain areas where all-terrain vehicles are allowed to operate. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author)
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Silk
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback