OK SB640 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - SCs named Crain, Bingman, Schulz, Marlatt, Burrage, Sparks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - SCs named Crain, Bingman, Schulz, Marlatt, Burrage, Sparks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Department of Human Services; medicaid; sliding scale for premium assistance. Effective date.
Title
Department of Human Services; medicaid; sliding scale for premium assistance. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House: Public Health and Social Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House: Public Health and Social Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Senate | SCs named Crain, Bingman, Schulz, Marlatt, Burrage, Sparks |
2013-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 2 |
2013-04-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin |
2013-04-15 | House | General Order |
2013-04-01 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Cox (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Remove as author Senator David; authored by Senator Crain |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1010 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 26 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |