OK SB64 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Aerial luminaries; making it unlawful to sell, distribute, possess, ignite or use aerial luminaries.
Title
Aerial luminaries; making it unlawful to sell, distribute, possess, ignite or use aerial luminaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 36 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2013 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | coauthored by Vaughan |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 26; Ayes: 36 Nays: 55 |
2013-04-18 | House | General Order |
2013-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 12 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Shortey |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Joyner (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Barrington |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |