OK SB638 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB638
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Professional Employer Organization Recognition and Registration Act; modifying registration requirements. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Professional Employer Organization Recognition and Registration Act; modifying registration requirements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/05/2023 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 2 |
2023-04-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sneed |
2023-04-26 | House | General Order |
2023-04-19 | House | Remove Representative Sneed as principal House author and substitute with Representative Tedford |
2023-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2023-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Montgomery |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB638 (Carry Over) 2023-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2023