OK SB633 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Military Code; modifying and repealing certain sections of the Oklahoma Military Code. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Military Code; modifying and repealing certain sections of the Oklahoma Military Code. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor 04/26/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-18 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-18 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 | |
2011-04-18 | General Order | |
2011-04-05 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-15 | Title restored | |
2011-03-15 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-03-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-16 | coauthored by Jordan (principal House author) | |
2011-02-16 | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Sykes | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
44 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 208 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 21 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 214 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 226 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 227 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 231 | 11 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 232 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 232 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 232 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 232 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 232 | 6 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 232 | 7 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 233 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 233 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 233 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 233 | 4 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 233 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 233 | 6 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 233 | 8 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 236 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 30 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 31 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 32 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 42 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |