OK SB631 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Infringement of Second Amendment rights; creating the Second Amendment Sanctuary State Act; considering certain action as infringing on the right to keep and bear arms; directing courts and law enforcement agencies to protect certain rights. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Infringement of Second Amendment rights; creating the Second Amendment Sanctuary State Act; considering certain action as infringing on the right to keep and bear arms; directing courts and law enforcement agencies to protect certain rights. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateApproved by Governor 04/26/2021
2021-04-21SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-21HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-21SenateEnrolled, to House
2021-04-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2021-04-21SenateCoauthored by Representative Manger
2021-04-20HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-20HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 17
2021-04-20HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey, Lowe (Dick), Stark, Lawson, Patzkowsky, Russ
2021-04-20HouseGeneral Order
2021-03-30HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Taylor
2021-03-30HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Townley, Olsen, Randleman, Kendrix, Steagall, Boles, Mize, Gann, CrosswhiteHader, Williams, Stearman
2021-03-30HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2021-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-09SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-09SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8
2021-03-09SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2021-03-09Senatecoauthored by McDugle
2021-03-08SenateCoauthored by Senator Montgomery
2021-03-08Senatecoauthored by Davis
2021-03-04Senatecoauthored by Bashore
2021-03-03Senatecoauthored by West (Kevin)
2021-03-01Senatecoauthored by Smith
2021-03-01SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Leewright
2021-02-25Senatecoauthored by Grego
2021-02-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Standridge
2021-02-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Garvin
2021-02-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Jett
2021-02-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Leewright
2021-02-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Pederson
2021-02-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Pemberton
2021-02-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2021-02-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Burns
2021-02-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Newhouse
2021-02-22SenateCoauthored by Senator Dahm
2021-02-22SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2021-02-22Senatecoauthored by Hardin (David)
2021-02-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Stephens
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Rogers
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
2021-02-08SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Hamilton
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb631&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB631%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB631%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB631%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB631%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB631%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/SB/SB631%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB631%20PCS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB631%20(3-08-21)%20(HAMILTON)%20FS%20FA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB631%20FA1%20BELLME-GRS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB631%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB631%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB631%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB631%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB631%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB631_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB631_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback