OK SB616 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB616
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pardons and parole; requiring Pardon and Parole Board to provide certain remediation measures; providing for revocation of parole. Effective date.
Title
Pardons and parole; requiring Pardon and Parole Board to provide certain remediation measures; providing for revocation of parole. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Darcy Jech [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] | Rep. Stan May [R] | Sen. Rob Standridge [R] |
Sen. Allison Ikley-Freeman [D] | Sen. George Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Died in conference |
2019-05-16 | Senate | coauthored by May |
2019-05-08 | Senate | SCs named Jech, Daniels, Bice, Coleman, Shaw, Brooks, Floyd, Matthews |
2019-05-08 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Ikley-Freeman |
2019-05-06 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2019-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3 |
2019-04-25 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended |
2019-04-25 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-04-25 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Standridge |
2019-04-25 | House | General Order |
2019-04-25 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar |
2019-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Young |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jech |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB616 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Died in conference