OK SB616 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - coauthored by May
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Pardons and parole; requiring Pardon and Parole Board to provide certain remediation measures; providing for revocation of parole. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pardons and parole; requiring Pardon and Parole Board to provide certain remediation measures; providing for revocation of parole. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16Senatecoauthored by May
2019-05-08SenateSCs named Jech, Daniels, Bice, Coleman, Shaw, Brooks, Floyd, Matthews
2019-05-08HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
2019-05-07SenateCoauthored by Senator Ikley-Freeman
2019-05-06SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-29SenateHAs read
2019-04-29HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3
2019-04-25HouseEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-25HouseAmended
2019-04-25HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-25HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Standridge
2019-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-25HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar
2019-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-18SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
2019-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-02-26SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
2019-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-20SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Young
2019-02-11SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-11SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Jech
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback