OK SB606 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB606
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sellers of food; providing for licensure and requirements of unattended food establishments; fees; taxes. Emergency.
Title
Sellers of food; providing for licensure and requirements of unattended food establishments; fees; taxes. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Emergency added |
2019-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules |
2019-04-10 | House | Withdrawn from Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dossett |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB606 (Carry Over) 2019-04-11 - Emergency added