OK SB605 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB605
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credit; modifying required calculation by Tax Commission. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Income tax credit; modifying required calculation by Tax Commission. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/05/2023 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 |
2023-04-26 | House | General Order |
2023-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2023-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB605 (Carry Over) 2023-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2023