OK SB6 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB6
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; statewide or federally elected or appointed officials to carry a firearm; inclusions of carrying of firearms. Effective date.
Title
Firearms; statewide or federally elected or appointed officials to carry a firearm; inclusions of carrying of firearms. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] | Rep. Kevin Calvey [R] | Rep. John Enns [R] |
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R] | Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Rep. Chuck Strohm [R] | Rep. Greg Babinec [R] |
Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] | Rep. Rick West [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Conferees unable to agree |
2017-05-11 | Senate | SCs named Brecheen, Fry, Thompson, Shaw, Pugh, Floyd, Matthews |
2017-05-10 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on General Government Oversight and Accountability |
2017-05-04 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-05-01 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-05-01 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 11 |
2017-04-27 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-27 | House | Title stricken |
2017-04-27 | House | Amended |
2017-04-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Babinec, McCall, Humphrey, Cleveland, West (Rick), Russ, Enns, Calvey |
2017-04-27 | House | General Order |
2017-04-13 | House | Title restored |
2017-04-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John), Ritze, Strohm, Roberts (Sean) |
2017-04-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to General Government Oversight and Accountability |
2017-04-12 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Coody (principal House author) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB6 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Conferees unable to agree
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1289 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1289 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |