OK SB6 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; statewide or federally elected or appointed officials to carry a firearm; inclusions of carrying of firearms. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; statewide or federally elected or appointed officials to carry a firearm; inclusions of carrying of firearms. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25SenateConferees unable to agree
2017-05-11SenateSCs named Brecheen, Fry, Thompson, Shaw, Pugh, Floyd, Matthews
2017-05-10HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on General Government Oversight and Accountability
2017-05-04SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2017-05-01SenateHAs read
2017-05-01HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-27HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 11
2017-04-27HouseEnacting clause stricken
2017-04-27HouseTitle stricken
2017-04-27HouseAmended
2017-04-27HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Babinec, McCall, Humphrey, Cleveland, West (Rick), Russ, Enns, Calvey
2017-04-27HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-13HouseTitle restored
2017-04-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John), Ritze, Strohm, Roberts (Sean)
2017-04-13HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
2017-04-12HouseHouse Rule suspended
2017-04-12HouseReferred to General Government Oversight and Accountability
2017-04-12HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
2017-03-22HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-22SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
2017-03-21SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-03-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Coody (principal House author)
2017-03-02SenateTitle stricken
2017-03-02SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21128929New CodeSee Bill Text
21128931Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb6&Session=1700
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB6%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB6%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB6%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB6%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB6%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB6%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB6%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB6_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB6_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback