OK SB599 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
An act relating to professional development in schools; creating the school administrator professional development pilot program. Codification. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
An act relating to professional development in schools; creating the school administrator professional development pilot program. Codification. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-07 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-23 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-22 | coauthored by Nollan (principal House author) | |
2011-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Paddack | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |