OK SB597 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB597
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading rescinded
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading rescinded
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education; creating a task force to study how four-year colleges can assist two-year colleges to save money.
Title
Higher education; creating a task force to study how four-year colleges can assist two-year colleges to save money.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Second Reading rescinded |
2019-03-25 | House | Withdrawn from Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 14 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB597 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Second Reading rescinded