OK SB595 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB595
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; creating the Farmers Market Liability Limitation Act. Effective date.
Title
Agriculture; creating the Farmers Market Liability Limitation Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Darcy Jech [R] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/03/2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 4 |
2017-04-26 | House | General Order |
2017-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2017-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jech |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB595 (Carry Over) 2017-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 5 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 5 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 5 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |