OK SB593 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB593
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-20 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-20 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ad valorem tax; adding definition of Satellite Internet service provider; clarifying definition. Emergency.
Title
Ad valorem tax; adding definition of Satellite Internet service provider; clarifying definition. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Chad Caldwell [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] |
Sen. Darcy Jech [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-11 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2022-05-05 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2022-05-04 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Thompson; authored by Senator Pugh |
2022-04-28 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-04-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | General Order |
2022-04-21 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-21 | House | Title stricken |
2022-04-21 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jech, Allen |
2022-04-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad) |
2022-04-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Emergency added |
2021-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB593 (Carry Over) 2021-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget