OK SB582 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-24 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-24 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Service liens on personal property; modifying certain notice and procedural requirements. Effective date.
Title
Service liens on personal property; modifying certain notice and procedural requirements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Conferees unable to agree |
2013-05-08 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-02 | Senate | SCs named Brinkley, Sykes, Johnson (Rob), David, McAffrey, Paddack |
2013-05-01 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 8 |
2013-04-22 | House | General Order |
2013-04-09 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-19 | Senate | coauthored by Quinn (principal House author) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brinkley |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |