OK SB580 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB580
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Veto override message received
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Veto override message received
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Housing; modifying certain definition used in the Oklahoma Housing Authority Act. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Housing; modifying certain definition used in the Oklahoma Housing Authority Act. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: VETO OVERRIDE (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Veto override message received |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Measure sent to House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Veto overridden: Ayes: 43 Nays: 5 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Vetoed 04/25/2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 5 |
2023-04-18 | House | General Order |
2023-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 3 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hall |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB580 (Carry Over) 2023-04-26 - Veto override message received