OK SB575 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB575
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Parents' Bill of Rights; allowing certain consent provided to a school district to be effective for a school year. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Parents' Bill of Rights; allowing certain consent provided to a school district to be effective for a school year. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/09/2019 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-06 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 4 |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended |
2019-04-25 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered |
2019-04-25 | House | Laid over |
2019-04-25 | House | General Order |
2019-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2019-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kiger |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Randleman (principal House author) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB575 (Carry Over) 2019-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2019