OK SB57 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure
Pending: House Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure
Pending: House Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Letters of guardianship; providing for certain renewal. Effective date.
Title
Letters of guardianship; providing for certain renewal. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-02-02 | Senate | coauthored by Williams (principal House author) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Anderson |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 1 | 123 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 4 | 307 | New Code | See Bill Text |