OK SB566 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Hunting; authorizing hunting guides to operate on public lands. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting; authorizing hunting guides to operate on public lands. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-17HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-17HouseMotion expired
2019-04-15HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative McDugle
2019-04-15HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 49
2019-04-15HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Tadlock
2019-04-15HouseGeneral Order
2019-03-27HouseCR; Do Pass Wildlife Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Wildlife
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 11
2019-03-12SenateTitle restored
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Wallace
2019-03-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Leewright
2019-02-26SenateCoauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author)
2019-02-18SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Murdock
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback