OK SB564 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB564
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Remove Representative Mize as principal House author and substitute with Representative Caldwell (Trey)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Remove Representative Mize as principal House author and substitute with Representative Caldwell (Trey)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
County and county officers; providing criteria for the dispersion of rewards by board of county commissioners. Effective date.
Title
County and county officers; providing criteria for the dispersion of rewards by board of county commissioners. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Hall [R] | Rep. Garry Mize [R] | Rep. Trey Caldwell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Remove Representative Mize as principal House author and substitute with Representative Caldwell (Trey) |
2021-04-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Trey) |
2021-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2021-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Mize (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hall |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB564 (Carry Over) 2021-04-06 - Remove Representative Mize as principal House author and substitute with Representative Caldwell (Trey)